OK HB2159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2159
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; directing the court clerk to notify the Tax Commission when defendant fails to enter plea or timely appear for arraignment; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; directing the court clerk to notify the Tax Commission when defendant fails to enter plea or timely appear for arraignment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Failed in Committee - General Government |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2159 (Carry Over) 2017-04-10 - Failed in Committee - General Government