OK HB2090 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Vetoed 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Vetoed 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; Rural Broadband Expansion Council; membership; incentive awards; emergency.
Title
Telecommunications; Rural Broadband Expansion Council; membership; incentive awards; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Vetoed 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Technology |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2090 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Vetoed 04/23/2021