OK HB2034 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2034
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; requiring divestment of certain financial companies; establishing provisions and requirements; effective date.
Title
State government; requiring divestment of certain financial companies; establishing provisions and requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] |
Rep. Steve Bashore [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 14 |
2022-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2022-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore, Roberts (Sean) |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Taylor; authored by Senator Allen |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Energy |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell |
2021-02-18 | House | Remove Representative ODonnell as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to General Government |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2034 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee