OK HB2034 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State contracts; declaring the oil and gas industry a vital economic partner; prohibiting state contracts without certain written certification; approval; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State contracts; declaring the oil and gas industry a vital economic partner; prohibiting state contracts without certain written certification; approval; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 21
2021-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
2021-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin)
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
2021-02-18HouseRemove Representative ODonnell as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride
2021-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to General Government
2021-02-17HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative ODonnell
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2034&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2034%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2034%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2034%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2034%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2034%20FULLPCS1%20MARK%20MCBRIDE-JL.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2034%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2034%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB2034%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2034_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback