OK HB2004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to competencies and methods to be incorporated into teacher preparation systems; adding mental health training. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to competencies and methods to be incorporated into teacher preparation systems; adding mental health training. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. Wallace Collins [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House: R (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-03-05 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | To Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Collins | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-11 | HC's named: Wright (Harold), Cannaday, McDaniel (Jeannie), Ortega, Nelson, Hickman, Denney | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-14 | SA's received | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-13 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2010-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 14 | |
2009-03-10 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-10 | House Rule suspended | |
2009-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2009-03-10 | Considered | |
2009-03-05 | Laid over | |
2009-03-05 | Returned to General Order | |
2009-03-05 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 71 Nays: 9 | |
2009-03-02 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright (Harold) | |
2009-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 59 | |
2009-03-02 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton | |
2009-03-02 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Wright (Harold) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |