OK HB1992 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1992
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Juvenile Code; requiring the Office of Juvenile Affairs to provide certain report; effective date; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Juvenile Code; requiring the Office of Juvenile Affairs to provide certain report; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Emergency added |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 14 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley |
2021-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021