OK HB1903 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; providing for determination of timely mailing of certain documents; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; providing for determination of timely mailing of certain documents; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-20 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-05-19 CCR adopted, GCCA
2011-05-18 CCR read, GCCA
2011-05-18 To Senate
2011-05-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 Title restored
2011-05-17 CCR submitted
2011-05-05 Conference granted, GCCA
2011-05-03 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation
2011-04-27 SA's received
2011-04-27 Engrossed to House
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2011-04-26 General Order, Considered
2011-04-07 Title stricken
2011-04-07 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2011-03-23 Second Reading referred to Finance
2011-03-22 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-17 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-17 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2011-03-17 Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
2011-03-17 General Order
2011-03-03 CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to General Government
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Jackson
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6828022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback