OK HB1783 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prescription drugs; prohibiting more than two refills for any product containing hydrocodone with another active ingredient; effective date.
Title
Prescription drugs; prohibiting more than two refills for any product containing hydrocodone with another active ingredient; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 6 |
2013-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2013-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2013-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 35 |
2013-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 3 |
2013-03-06 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Russ |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 63 |
2013-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |