OK HB1600 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Coleman, Burns, Haste, Jett, Newhouse, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Coleman, Burns, Haste, Jett, Newhouse, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Digital asset mining; sales tax exemption; effective date.
Title
Digital asset mining; sales tax exemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Coleman, Burns, Haste, Jett, Newhouse, Young |
2023-05-17 | House | Naming of conferees rescinded |
2023-05-15 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2023-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2023-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 20 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 33 |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1600 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Coleman, Burns, Haste, Jett, Newhouse, Young