OK HB1574 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Title
Mental health; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Anderson, Crain, Paddack | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Title restored | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 | |
2010-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 410 | New Code | See Bill Text |