OK HB1568 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; video toll collection system; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; video toll collection system; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 36 |
2015-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 54 Nays: 16 |
2015-03-04 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 45 |
2015-03-04 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |