OK HB1513 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisoner training; directing the State Board of Career and Technology Education to implement certain training programs; effective date.
Title
Prisoner training; directing the State Board of Career and Technology Education to implement certain training programs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: CareerTech Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: CareerTech Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 11 |
2013-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton |
2013-03-07 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2013-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |