OK HB1319 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Probate procedure; providing for conveyance of certain mineral interest; requiring court clerks to accept certain affidavits as conveyances. Emergency.
Title
Probate procedure; providing for conveyance of certain mineral interest; requiring court clerks to accept certain affidavits as conveyances. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-04 | General Order | |
2009-02-19 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Shoemake | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |