OK HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1279
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; modifying definitions; amending requirements for inpatient treatment; effective date.
Title
Mental health; modifying definitions; amending requirements for inpatient treatment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1279 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019