OK HB1279 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health; modifying definitions; amending requirements for inpatient treatment; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; modifying definitions; amending requirements for inpatient treatment; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseApproved by Governor 05/14/2019
2019-05-08HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-07HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-07HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-05-07HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2019-03-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1279&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1279%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1279%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1279%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1279%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1279%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1279%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1279%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1279_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1279_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback