OK HB1270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Welfare; creating the Act to Restore Hope, Opportunity and Prosperity for Everyone or the HOPE Act; effective date.
Title
Welfare; creating the Act to Restore Hope, Opportunity and Prosperity for Everyone or the HOPE Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-23 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hall |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 25 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered |
2017-03-22 | House | Laid over |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1270 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - SA's received