OK HB1263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal record expungements; providing for the reimbursement of filing fees and costs under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Criminal record expungements; providing for the reimbursement of filing fees and costs under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman, Matthews |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |