OK HB1212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State government; providing peace officers of the Department of Corrections the option to purchase firearm prior to retirement; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; providing peace officers of the Department of Corrections the option to purchase firearm prior to retirement; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Governor 04/04/2019
2019-04-01HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-01SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-01HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-03-28HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-03-28SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-03-28SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-03-28SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-25SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-28HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
2019-02-27HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Newton
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback