OK HB1163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Authored by Senator Pittman (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Authored by Senator Pittman (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Municipal Fire Protection District Act; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Municipal Fire Protection District Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Pittman (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Perryman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 29 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |