OK HB1110 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Salary Increase Act V.
Title
Schools; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Salary Increase Act V.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-09-25 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-09-25 | House | First Reading |