OK HB1088 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporations; Oklahoma Limited Liability Company Act; enabling low-profit limited liability companies; effective date.
Title
Corporations; Oklahoma Limited Liability Company Act; enabling low-profit limited liability companies; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4 | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Grau | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |