OK HB1082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; prohibiting the sale of certain unmounted tires; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibiting the sale of certain unmounted tires; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Motion expired |
2015-02-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 48 |
2015-02-12 | House | General Order |
2015-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |