OK HB1071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1071
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; certified services; drug and alcohol treatment; effective date.
Title
Mental health; certified services; drug and alcohol treatment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021