OK HB1066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; expanding sales tax exemption to include sales to certain surviving spouses and children; repealer; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; expanding sales tax exemption to include sales to certain surviving spouses and children; repealer; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Rules
2019-02-27HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback