OK HB1066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; expanding sales tax exemption to include sales to certain surviving spouses and children; repealer; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; expanding sales tax exemption to include sales to certain surviving spouses and children; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pae |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1066 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1066&Session=2000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1066%20INT.PDF |