OK HB1032 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1032
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Home Bakery Act of 2013; home food establishments; homemade food products; Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; beekeepers; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Home Bakery Act of 2013; home food establishments; homemade food products; Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; beekeepers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens, Jett |
2021-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Rosecrants |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Roberts (Eric) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Steagall, Lepak, Bashore, Hill, Humphrey, West (Tammy), Kendrix, Osburn, Grego, Dempsey, Stark |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Bennett |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Mize |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021