OK HB1032 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; Home Bakery Act of 2013; home food establishments; homemade food products; Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; beekeepers; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; Home Bakery Act of 2013; home food establishments; homemade food products; Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; beekeepers; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-05SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-05HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-04HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-04HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2021-05-04HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Stephens, Jett
2021-05-04HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-04-14HouseSA's received
2021-04-14SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2021-04-13SenateTitle restored
2021-04-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2021-03-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2021-03-15Senatecoauthored by Rosecrants
2021-03-15Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Eric)
2021-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2021-03-10HouseTitle stricken
2021-03-10HouseAmended
2021-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2021-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Steagall, Lepak, Bashore, Hill, Humphrey, West (Tammy), Kendrix, Osburn, Grego, Dempsey, Stark
2021-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Bennett
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Mize
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1032&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1032%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1032%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1032%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1032%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1032%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1032%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1032%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1032%20FULLPCS1%20GARRY%20MIZE-AB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1032%20FA1%20MIZEGA-AB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1032%20FA2%20HILBERTKY-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1032%20(4-06-21)%20(PUGH)%20RT%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1032%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1032%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1032%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1032%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1032%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1032%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1032_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1032_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback