OK HB1032 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; relating to certain patient affidavit requirement; modifying affidavit to form; providing that false statements shall be considered willful misrepresentation; effective date.
Title
Insurance; relating to certain patient affidavit requirement; modifying affidavit to form; providing that false statements shall be considered willful misrepresentation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Cooksey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |