OH SB221 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 101.35, 103.05, 103.0511, 106.021, 106.03, 106.031, 107.52, 111.15, 119.03, 121.39, 121.71, 121.72, 121.73, 121.74, 121.75, 127.18, 145.09, 742.10, 1707.20, 3304.15, 3307.04, 3309.04, 3375.01, and 5505.04; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 127.18 (106.024); to enact sections 101.352, 101.353, 106.032, 121.93, 121.931, and 121.933; and to repeal section 121.76 of the Revised Code to reform agency rule-making and legislative review thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reform agency rule-making and legislative review of rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenatePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2018-11-14SenateVeto receipt
2018-06-27HousePassed
2018-06-27HouseInformally passed
2018-06-27HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-06-27SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-05-15HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-04-12HouseIntroduced
2018-04-11SenatePassed
2018-03-21SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-10-25SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-10-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
101New CodeSee Bill Text
10135Amended CodeCitation Text
101352New CodeSee Bill Text
101353New CodeSee Bill Text
103Amended CodeCitation Text
10305Amended CodeCitation Text
1030511Amended CodeCitation Text
106Amended CodeCitation Text
106021Amended CodeCitation Text
10603Amended CodeCitation Text
106031Amended CodeCitation Text
106032New CodeSee Bill Text
107Amended CodeCitation Text
10752Amended CodeCitation Text
111Amended CodeCitation Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11903Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12139Amended CodeCitation Text
12171Amended CodeCitation Text
12172Amended CodeCitation Text
12173Amended CodeCitation Text
12174Amended CodeCitation Text
12175Amended CodeCitation Text
12176Repealed CodeCitation Text
12193New CodeSee Bill Text
121931New CodeSee Bill Text
121932New CodeSee Bill Text
121933New CodeSee Bill Text
127Amended CodeCitation Text
12718Amended CodeCitation Text
145Amended CodeCitation Text
14509Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1707Amended CodeCitation Text
170720Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3304Amended CodeCitation Text
330415Amended CodeCitation Text
3307Amended CodeCitation Text
330704Amended CodeCitation Text
3309Amended CodeCitation Text
330904Amended CodeCitation Text
3375Amended CodeCitation Text
337501Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5505Amended CodeCitation Text
550504Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
742Amended CodeCitation Text
74210Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback