OH SB186 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-26)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-26)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4501.21 and to enact section 4503.554 of the Revised Code to create the "Knights of Columbus" license plate.
Title
To create the "Knights of Columbus" license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-03-11 | Governor' Action | |
2014-03-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-03-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-02-26 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-13 | Committee Report | |
2013-09-05 | To Transportation | |
2013-09-05 | Introduced to House | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-20 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-11-20 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 554 | New Code | See Bill Text |