OH SB158 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-04-09 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.07, 2301.02, and 2301.03 of the Revised Code to add a judge to the Adams County Court of Common Pleas, who shall be elected in 2026, and designated as the judge of the court's Probate and Juvenile Division on February 9, 2029.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards disbursement of municipal funds by residents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-04-09 Effective
2025-01-08 Signed By The Governor
2024-12-30 Sent To The Governor
2024-12-18HouseInformally passed
2024-12-18HouseReported - Substitute: Government Oversight
2024-12-18SenateConcurred in House amendments
2024-12-18HousePassed
2023-10-03HouseReferred to committee: Government Oversight
2023-10-02HouseIntroduced
2023-09-27SenatePassed
2023-09-27SenateReported - Amended: General Government
2023-09-20SenateReferred to committee: General Government
2023-09-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215107Amended CodeCitation Text
230102Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/sb158
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/sb158/00_IN/pdf/
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/sb158/01_RS/pdf/
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/sb158/02_PS/pdf/
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21385
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21422
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21435
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21436
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21454
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21455
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/sb158/votes

Bill Comments

feedback