OH HB247 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-18)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-18)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.235, 3701.85, 5122.11, and 5122.111 of the Revised Code to make clear that any person may perform automated external defibrillation, to extend qualified immunity from civil liability to premises owners and other persons involved with automated external defibrillator placement and use, to allow proceedings for a mentally ill person subject to court order to be in a probate court in any county, rather than in the county where the mentally ill person subject to court order resides, and to modify the form of the affidavit used to initiate proceedings for court-ordered treatment of a mentally ill person.
Title
To make clear that any person may perform automated external defibrillation, to extend qualified immunity from civil liability to premises owners and other persons involved with automated external defibrillator placement and use, to allow proceedings for a mentally ill person subject to court order to be in a probate court in any county, rather than in the county where the mentally ill person subject to court order resides, and to modify the form of the affidavit used to initiate proceedings for court-ordered treatment of a mentally ill person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-14 | To *Civil Justice | |
2013-11-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-11-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-17 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-08-15 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-08-15 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 22 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 22 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |