OH HB206 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-37)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-37)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4501.21 and 5101.98 and to enact sections 4503.527, 4503.534, and 4503.535 of the Revised Code to create the "Ohio Statehouse" license plate, the "Disabled American Veteran" license plate, and the "POW/MIA Awareness" license plate.
Title
To create the "Ohio Statehouse" license plate, the "Disabled American Veteran" license plate, and the "POW/MIA Awareness" license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-19 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-04-02 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-03-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-12 | To Transportation | |
2013-12-12 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-29 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-12 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-06-12 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 527 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 03 | 534 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 03 | 535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 01 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |