OH HB178 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3717.22 and 4301.62 and to enact section 4303.2010 of the Revised Code to establish the F-10 liquor permit to authorize the sale of wine by certain wine manufacturers at specified farmers markets.
Title
Allows Ohio wine sales at farmers markets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported: Agriculture |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-27 | House | Passed |
2016-01-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 17 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 03 | 2010 | New Code | See Bill Text |