OH HB113 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-06-25 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-06-25 - Effective Date
Summary
To enact sections 5120.034 and 5139.14 of the Revised Code to allow representatives of faith-based and other community organizations to provide reentry services to persons in the custody of the Department of Rehabilitation and Correction or the Department of Youth Services.
Title
Faith-based/community organizations-reentry services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-25 | Effective Date | |
2008-03-25 | Governor Action | |
2008-03-29 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-03-12 | Concurrence | |
2008-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-02-06 | Committee Report | |
2007-06-14 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2007-06-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-05-29 | Committee Report | |
2007-03-20 | To Criminal Justice | |
2007-03-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_113 |