NY S65071 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2009 to November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authorization granted to the county of Genesee to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2009 to November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authorization granted to the county of Genesee to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S3176 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
A6993 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
S54310 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44310 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
A6993 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
S54310 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44310 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES