NY A06993 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
Summary
The bill would extend the authorization of Genesee County to impose an additional one percent sales tax.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2009 to November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authorization granted to the county of Genesee to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.124 | |
2009-07-09 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.196 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3176 | |
2009-06-11 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-09 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-09 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-09 | home rule request | |
2009-06-08 | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 | |
2009-06-08 | rules report cal.88 | |
2009-06-08 | reported | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-03-18 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03176 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.124
S54310 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44310 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65071 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S54310 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44310 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65071 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06993&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |