NY S60401 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to low cost power; extends expiration of the power for jobs program and the energy costs savings benefit program; establishes an energy audit program.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to low cost power; extends expiration of the power for jobs program and the energy costs savings benefit program; establishes an energy audit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-28 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A9039 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.217
S6031 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.217
S65001 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65108 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - REFERRED TO RULES
S6031 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.217
S65001 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65108 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - REFERRED TO RULES