NY S09415 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to certain urban development action areas rehabilitation or conservation projects.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to certain urban development action areas rehabilitation or conservation projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.166 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.383 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a10404 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1339 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A10404 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9415