NY S09308 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions dealing with tax exemptions for rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions dealing with tax exemptions for rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10142 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1414 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A10142 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.292