NY S09296 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows retirees of the New York state teachers' retirement system who suspend their retirement the option of a benefit recalculation after two years of service.
Title
Allows retirees of the New York state teachers' retirement system who suspend their retirement the option of a benefit recalculation after two years of service.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.138 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.688 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7184a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1405 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07184 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9296