NY S09294 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10105B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10105B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of mental health care provider to include licensed mental health counselors and licensed marriage and family therapists, for purposes of certain sex offenses committed during a treatment session, consultation, interview, or examination.
Title
Expands the definition of mental health care provider to include licensed mental health counselors and licensed marriage and family therapists, for purposes of certain sex offenses committed during a treatment session, consultation, interview, or examination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10105B |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9294A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1450 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10105 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY