NY S09276 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows evidence of a defendant's prior sexual offense to be admissible in a sexual assault proceeding.
Title
Allows evidence of a defendant's prior sexual offense to be admissible in a sexual assault proceeding.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jessica Scarcella-Spanton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1161 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04992 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - print number 4992b