NY S09170 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maintenance of abandoned cemeteries; authorizes a solvent not-for-profit cemetery corporation that merges with an abandoned cemetery in a city to apply for state funds for the maintenance of an abandoned cemetery.
Title
Relates to the maintenance of abandoned cemeteries; authorizes a solvent not-for-profit cemetery corporation that merges with an abandoned cemetery in a city to apply for state funds for the maintenance of an abandoned cemetery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1710 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9170A |
2022-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10208 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - amended on third reading (t) 10208a