NY S09146 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions which authorize the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Title
Extends provisions which authorize the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9146B |
2022-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9146A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1596 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10241 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.743