NY S08872 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Brookhaven Fire District with respect to the 2020-2021 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Brookhaven Fire District with respect to the 2020-2021 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.463 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.732 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10032 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1579 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10032 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8872