NY A10032 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Brookhaven Fire District with respect to the 2020-2021 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Brookhaven Fire District with respect to the 2020-2021 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] |
Asm. John Mikulin [R] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8872 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.732 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08872 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.463