NY S08859 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state University Trustees, without any public bidding, to lease and otherwise contract to make available to Farmingdale state development corporation, a not-for-profit corporation, a portion of the lands of the university for the purpose of developing, constructing, maintaining and operating a multi-purpose athletic facility to support the provision of athletic tournaments, camps, clinics and other opportunities for Farmingdale students and local community residents; provides such lease shall be a term of thirty years; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes state University Trustees, without any public bidding, to lease and otherwise contract to make available to Farmingdale state development corporation, a not-for-profit corporation, a portion of the lands of the university for the purpose of developing, constructing, maintaining and operating a multi-purpose athletic facility to support the provision of athletic tournaments, camps, clinics and other opportunities for Farmingdale students and local community residents; provides such lease shall be a term of thirty years; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.538 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.489 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a9980 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1248 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09980 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8859