NY A09980 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state University Trustees, without any public bidding, to lease and otherwise contract to make available to Farmingdale state development corporation, a not-for-profit corporation, a portion of the lands of the university for the purpose of developing, constructing, maintaining and operating a multi-purpose athletic facility to support the provision of athletic tournaments, camps, clinics and other opportunities for Farmingdale students and local community residents; provides such lease shall be a term of thirty years; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes state University Trustees, without any public bidding, to lease and otherwise contract to make available to Farmingdale state development corporation, a not-for-profit corporation, a portion of the lands of the university for the purpose of developing, constructing, maintaining and operating a multi-purpose athletic facility to support the provision of athletic tournaments, camps, clinics and other opportunities for Farmingdale students and local community residents; provides such lease shall be a term of thirty years; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s8859 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.489 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08859 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.538