NY S08817 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.
Title
Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.307 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1026 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8817 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | amended on third reading 4739c |
2020-01-13 | Senate | amended on third reading 4739b |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.179 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.542 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2000B |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.490 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4739a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1675 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2000A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted by s2000a |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.490 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.490 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-03 | Senate | print number 4739a |
2019-06-03 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4739C |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1026 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04739 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES